OK HB2177 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2177

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Historical artifacts; authorizing entities to display historically significant documents on property; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historical artifacts; authorizing entities to display historically significant documents on property; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 7 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseApproved by Governor 05/11/2018
2018-05-03HouseSent to Governor
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-05-03HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-05-03HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 14
2018-05-03HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Shaw
2018-05-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Frix, West (Kevin), Sanders, McCall, Lawson
2018-05-03HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-04-27HouseSA's received
2018-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3
2018-04-26SenateTitle restored
2018-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2018-03-07SenateRemove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator Silk
2018-03-07SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Silk
2017-04-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Quinn
2017-04-26Senatecoauthored by Murdock
2017-04-26Senatecoauthored by Hardin
2017-04-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2017-04-12SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-04-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-04-11SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2017-04-05SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2017-04-05SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 11
2017-03-21HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Allen, Brecheen, Dahm, Boggs, Silk
2017-03-21HouseAuthored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
2017-03-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Babinec, Coody, Faught, Ritze, Cleveland, Russ, Calvey, Nollan, Martinez, Humphrey, West (Josh), Jordan, Derby, Downing, Gann, Rogers, Roberts (Dustin), Murphey, Newton, Hilbert, Kerbs, Montgomery
2017-03-21HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick), Enns, Vaughan, Dunlap, McDugle, Moore, Brumbaugh, Strohm, Roberts (Sean)
2017-02-09HouseCR; Do Pass General Government Oversight and Accountability Oversight and Accountability Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Bennett (John)
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2177 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Coauthored by Senator Quinn

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2177&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2177%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2177%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2177%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2177%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2177%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2177%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2177_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2177_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2177_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback