OK HB2177 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; 2011 Shale Reservoir Development Act; changing name of act; modifying certain development requirements; emergency.
Title
Oil and gas; 2011 Shale Reservoir Development Act; changing name of act; modifying certain development requirements; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Sen. Casey Murdock [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | SA's received |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride, Murdock |
2015-02-26 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
52 | 87 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 87 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 87 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 87 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 87 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |