OK HB2175 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-16 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-16 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Indigent Defense System; modifying scope of responsibilities; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Indigent Defense System; modifying scope of responsibilities; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 54 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | First Reading | |
2011-05-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-05-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 34; Ayes: 54 Nays: 27 | |
2011-05-13 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-13 | General Order | |
2011-05-12 | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-12 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-11 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author) | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Representative Sears, Martin (Scott) | |
2011-05-11 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1355 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 1355 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |