OK HB2174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Supreme Court; providing authorization to use funds for specified purposes; effective date.
Title
Supreme Court; providing authorization to use funds for specified purposes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 57 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 57 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 13 | |
2011-05-19 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | |
2011-05-17 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Myers | |
2011-05-17 | Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 25 | |
2011-05-17 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | First Reading | |
2011-05-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-05-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3; Ayes: 57 Nays: 30 | |
2011-05-13 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-13 | General Order | |
2011-05-12 | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-12 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-11 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author) | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Representative Sears, Martin (Scott) | |
2011-05-11 | First Reading |