OK HB2172 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2172
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; relating to using electronic communication devices to publish identifying information; expanding scope of crime; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; relating to using electronic communication devices to publish identifying information; expanding scope of crime; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 05/02/2023 |
2023-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Roe |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2172 (Carry Over) 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023