OK HB2172 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State-tribal relations; transferring the powers, duties, function and responsibilities of the Oklahoma Indian Affairs Commission; creating the position of Oklahoma Native American Liaison; effective date.
Title
State-tribal relations; transferring the powers, duties, function and responsibilities of the Oklahoma Indian Affairs Commission; creating the position of Oklahoma Native American Liaison; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 52 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: C (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 56 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 51 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 52 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: C (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 56 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 51 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 18 | |
2011-05-20 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | First Reading | |
2011-05-18 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-05-18 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2011-05-18 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 37 | |
2011-05-18 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Peters | |
2011-05-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 36 | |
2011-05-18 | Ayes: 54 Nays: 37 | |
2011-05-18 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | General Order | |
2011-05-12 | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-12 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-11 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author) | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Representative Sears, Martin (Scott) | |
2011-05-11 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 1201 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1203 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1205 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1221 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1226 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |