OK HB2170 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
General appropriations; purposes; authorizing expenditures; authorizing transfers; requiring deposit; effective date.
Title
General appropriations; purposes; authorizing expenditures; authorizing transfers; requiring deposit; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: C (Y: 52 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 53 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: C (Y: 52 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 53 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-17 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17 | |
2011-05-17 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | First Reading | |
2011-05-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-05-13 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2011-05-13 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears | |
2011-05-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 36 | |
2011-05-13 | Ayes: 52 Nays: 31 | |
2011-05-13 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-13 | General Order | |
2011-05-12 | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-12 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-11 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author) | |
2011-05-11 | Authored by Representative Sears, Martin (Scott) | |
2011-05-11 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |