OK HB2165 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2165

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Children; tobacco products; fines; requiring violator to attend program or class; city ordinances; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; tobacco products; fines; requiring violator to attend program or class; city ordinances; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseApproved by Governor 05/01/2023
2023-04-25HouseSent to Governor
2023-04-25SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-25HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-04-24HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-04-24SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
2023-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-04-13SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2023-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2023-03-29SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2023-03-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Waldron
2023-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 16
2023-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
2023-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
2023-02-14HouseReferred to County and Municipal Government
2023-02-14HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Roe
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2165 (Carry Over) 2023-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2165&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2165%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2165%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2165%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2165%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2165%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2165%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2165%20FULLPCS1%20CYNTHIA%20ROE-CMA.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2165%20FULLPCS2%20CYNTHIA%20ROE-CMA.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2165%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2165%20FULLPCS2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2165%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2165_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2165_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback