OK HB2161 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; Workers' Compensation Commission; Court of Existing Claims; revolving fund.
Title
Workers' compensation; Workers' Compensation Commission; Court of Existing Claims; revolving fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Died in GCCA |
2015-05-12 | House | HC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Judiciary and Civil Procedure and naming GCCA |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | House | Emergency not considered |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-10 | House | General Order |
2015-02-24 | House | Emergency added |
2015-02-24 | House | Title stricken |
2015-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative McCullough |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 902 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85A | 28 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |