OK HB2157 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2157

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health; Local Law Enforcement Mental Health Manpower Act; written statement; creating the Shannon Hanchett Act; mental health evaluation; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health; Local Law Enforcement Mental Health Manpower Act; written statement; creating the Shannon Hanchett Act; mental health evaluation; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2023-03-08HouseAmended
2023-03-08HouseHouse Rule suspended
2023-03-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants, Menz, Strom
2023-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-02HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2023-03-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Deck
2023-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2023-02-08HouseReferred to Public Safety
2023-02-08HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Roe
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2157 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2157&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2157%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2157%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2157%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2157%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2157%20FULLPCS1%20CYNTHIA%20ROE-TJ.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2157%20FULLPCS2%20CYNTHIA%20ROE-TJ.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2157%20FA1%20STROMJU-TJ(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2157%20FULLPCS2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2157%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2157%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2157_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback