OK HB2151 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2151
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corporation Commission; underground storage programs; statutory references; funds; effective date; emergency.
Title
Corporation Commission; underground storage programs; statutory references; funds; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2019 |
2019-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Utilities |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2151 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019