OK HB2151 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2151
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; creating the Oil and Gas Regulation Modernization Task Force; organizational meeting; exempting from Open Meetings Act; effective date.
Title
Oil and gas; creating the Oil and Gas Regulation Modernization Task Force; organizational meeting; exempting from Open Meetings Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Schulz, Marlatt, Fields, Griffin, Pederson, Floyd, Matthews |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 20 |
2017-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered |
2017-03-22 | House | Laid over |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-02-27 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2151 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree