OK HB2146 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB2146

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; authorizing the issuance of nonresident medical marijuana licenses; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; authorizing the issuance of nonresident medical marijuana licenses; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 59
2023-03-23HouseTitle stricken
2023-03-23HouseAmended
2023-03-23HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-22HouseAuthored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
2023-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
2023-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative McDugle
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2146 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 59

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2146&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2146%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2146%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2146%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2146%20FA1%20OSBURNMI-CC.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2146%20FULLPCS1%20KEVIN%20MCDUGLE-GRS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2146%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2146%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2146%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2146%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2146_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback