OK HB2141 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2141

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Placed on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

State Board of Cosmetology and Barbering; licensing fees; increasing fees; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Cosmetology and Barbering; licensing fees; increasing fees; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 12 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20SenatePlaced on Third Reading
2023-04-20SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2023-04-18SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Coleman
2023-04-18SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 12 Nays: 30
2023-04-18SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-04-10SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2023-03-23SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2023-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 11
2023-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-22HouseEmergency added
2023-02-22HouseAuthored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
2023-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative McDugle
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2141 (Carry Over) 2023-04-20 - Placed on Third Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2141&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2141%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2141%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2141%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2141%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2141%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2141%20FULLPCS1%20KEVIN%20MCDUGLE-LRB.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2141%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2141%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2141%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2141_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2141_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback