OK HB2140 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; State Government Administrative Process Consolidation and Reorganization Reform Act of 2011; repealer; effective date.
Title
State government; State Government Administrative Process Consolidation and Reorganization Reform Act of 2011; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 | |
2011-05-20 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 35 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2011-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2011-05-02 | SA's received | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 | |
2011-04-27 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-04-11 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Motion expired | |
2011-03-03 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Murphey | |
2011-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 28; Ayes: 53 Nays: 28 | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey | |
2011-03-03 | General Order | |
2011-02-21 | Emergency added | |
2011-02-21 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-21 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 34 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
67 | 306 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
67 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
67 | 312 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1365 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 61 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 61 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |