OK HB2132 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2132
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School truancy; requiring State Board of Education to provide truant student information to the Office of Child Abuse Prevention; effective date.
Title
School truancy; requiring State Board of Education to provide truant student information to the Office of Child Abuse Prevention; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amended |
2019-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Munson |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2132 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee