OK HB2132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

School truancy; requiring State Board of Education to provide truant student information to the Office of Child Abuse Prevention; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School truancy; requiring State Board of Education to provide truant student information to the Office of Child Abuse Prevention; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2
2019-03-07HouseAmended
2019-03-07HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-26HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2019-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Munson
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback