OK HB2132 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; eliminating certain concurrent funding requirement.
Title
Public finance; Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; eliminating certain concurrent funding requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - House - House: (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-03 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 25; Ayes: 58 Nays: 28 | |
2011-05-03 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-20 | SA's received | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13 | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-05 | coauthored by Mazzei | |
2011-04-05 | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) | |
2011-04-05 | Emergency added | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading | |
2011-02-28 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-24 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 28; Ayes: 61 Nays: 30 | |
2011-02-24 | General Order | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 3103 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
62 | 3107 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
62 | 3111 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
62 | 3112 | New Code | See Bill Text |