OK HB2130 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; repealer; calculation of instruction costs and total compensation to certified personnel for certain school year; effective date.
Title
Schools; repealer; calculation of instruction costs and total compensation to certified personnel for certain school year; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2015 |
2015-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Cleveland |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |