OK HB2126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2126
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; State Bureau of Investigation; expanding powers and duties to include reviewing and monitoring complaints of excessive force by law enforcement officers; effective date.
Title
State government; State Bureau of Investigation; expanding powers and duties to include reviewing and monitoring complaints of excessive force by law enforcement officers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2019 |
2019-05-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-02 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 16 |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 17 |
2019-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading rescinded |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed on Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Remove Representative Ortega as principal House author and substitute with Representative McDugle |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Ortega |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2126 (Carry Over) 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019