OK HB2122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2122
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; Oklahoma Cocktails To Go Act of 2021; cocktails or mixed drinks to go; effective date; emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; Oklahoma Cocktails To Go Act of 2021; cocktails or mixed drinks to go; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House: ADOPT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 53 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House: ADOPT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 53 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/07/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 35 |
2021-05-03 | House | Ayes: 53 Nays: 31 |
2021-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 20 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 20 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 27; Ayes: 68 Nays: 24 |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2122 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2021