OK HB2120 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2120
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Telemedicine; modifying definitions; effective date.
Title
Telemedicine; modifying definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2021-05-24 | Senate | CCR read |
2021-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2021-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Quinn, Taylor, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews |
2021-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2021-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2120 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021