OK HB2118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Corporation Commission; setback requirements for wind energy facilities; authorizing Aeronautics Commission to promulgate rules; notice of intent to build facility; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporation Commission; setback requirements for wind energy facilities; authorizing Aeronautics Commission to promulgate rules; notice of intent to build facility; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseApproved by Governor 05/07/2019
2019-05-02HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-01HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-01HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2019-05-01HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Luttrell
2019-05-01HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-04-04SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Manger
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McBride, Miller, Moore, Caldwell (Chad)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseEmergency added
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2019-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Ortega
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2118&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2118%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2118%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2118%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2118%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2118%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2118%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2118%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2118%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2118_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2118_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback