OK HB2117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Failed in Committee - Business, Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; Massage Therapy Practice Act; modifying various provisions; providing for licensure of massage therapy establishments; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; Massage Therapy Practice Act; modifying various provisions; providing for licensure of massage therapy establishments; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateFailed in Committee - Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 16; Ayes: 68 Nays: 22
2019-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
2019-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-18HouseEmergency added
2019-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Ortega
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback