OK HB2110 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2110

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; emergency medical assistance; immunity; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; emergency medical assistance; immunity; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2023-03-23SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21
2023-03-22HouseTitle stricken
2023-03-22HouseAmended
2023-03-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
2023-03-22HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-23HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2023-02-23HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Pae
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2110 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2110&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2110%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2110%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2110%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2110%20FA1%20PAEDA-GRS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2110%20FA2%20MARTINEZRY-CC.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2110%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2110%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2110_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback