OK HB2098 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2098
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor license agents; enacting the 21st Century Motor Tag Agent Act; agent qualifications and requirements; restrictions; violations and penalties; fees; effective date; emergency.
Title
Motor license agents; enacting the 21st Century Motor Tag Agent Act; agent qualifications and requirements; restrictions; violations and penalties; fees; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey) |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2098 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019