OK HB2086 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2086
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; providing for rates of compensation for on-call state employees; repealer; effective date.
Title
State government; providing for rates of compensation for on-call state employees; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7 |
2019-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Dollens |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2086 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations