OK HB2085 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2085
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; legal representation of agency; prohibiting certain attorneys from being voting members of boards or commissions; effective date.
Title
State government; legal representation of agency; prohibiting certain attorneys from being voting members of boards or commissions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization and: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization and: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-21 | House | Amended |
2023-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-21 | House | General Order |
2023-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Technology Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred to Government Modernization and Technology |
2023-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2085 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary