OK HB2085 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2085
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Coauthored by Senator Pederson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Coauthored by Senator Pederson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; providing for display of the national motto in state buildings; effective date.
Title
Public buildings and public works; providing for display of the national motto in state buildings; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by West (Kevin) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Russ |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 19 |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David), Lawson, Roe, Roberts (Sean), Dills, Frix, Hill, Humphrey |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass States Rights Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to States Rights |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall, ODonnell |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2085 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Coauthored by Senator Pederson