OK HB2077 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2077

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; directing the State Department of Education to establish an online transparency portal for review of certain school materials; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; directing the State Department of Education to establish an online transparency portal for review of certain school materials; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2023-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad)
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2077 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2077&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2077%20INT.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2077%20FULLAMD1%20CHAD%20CALDWELL-EK.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2077%20FULLAMD2%20CHAD%20CALDWELL-EK.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2077%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2077%20FULLAMD1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2077%20FULLAMD2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2077_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback