OK HB2075 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Insurance; modifying Employer Health Insurance Purchasing Group Act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; modifying Employer Health Insurance Purchasing Group Act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Died in conference
2012-05-03 Further conference granted, same conferees
2012-02-08 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development
2011-05-13 CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
2011-05-05 Conference granted, SCs named Brown, Brecheen, Aldridge, Stanislawski, Bass, Sparks
2011-05-03 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development
2011-04-20 SA's received
2011-04-20 Engrossed to House
2011-04-19 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-19 Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3
2011-04-19 coauthored by Stanislawski
2011-04-19 General Order, Amended
2011-04-19 Title restored
2011-04-11 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2011-03-23 Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2011-03-22 First Reading
2011-03-21 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-03-17 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-17 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2011-03-17 Title stricken
2011-03-17 Amended
2011-03-17 Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author)
2011-03-17 Remove Representative Key as principal House author and substitute with Representative Mulready
2011-03-17 General Order
2011-02-28 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2011-02-16 Referred to Insurance Committee
2011-02-16 Withdrawn from Rules Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Rules
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative Key
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback