OK HB2029 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2029
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; modifying powers and duties of the Wildlife Conservation Commission; specifying dates for deer hunting season; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; modifying powers and duties of the Wildlife Conservation Commission; specifying dates for deer hunting season; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 22 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 22 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Cornwell and substitute with Representative McDugle |
2019-04-04 | Senate | coauthored by McDugle |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18 |
2019-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-25 | House | General Order |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Cornwell |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2029 (Carry Over) 2019-04-17 - SA's received