OK HB2027 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2027
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; authorizing licensed attorneys to bypass certain security checkpoints; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; authorizing licensed attorneys to bypass certain security checkpoints; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4 |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative ODonnell |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2027 (Carry Over) 2021-04-05 - Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed