OK HB2025 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2025

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma adjusted gross income; itemized deductions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma adjusted gross income; itemized deductions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02HouseTitle stricken
2023-03-02HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2023-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2023-02-20HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2023-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Wolfley
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2025 (Carry Over) 2023-03-02 - Title stricken

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback