OK HB2019 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2019
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; directing courts to determine certain status of accused persons when considering pretrial release; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; directing courts to determine certain status of accused persons when considering pretrial release; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 24 |
2019-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-14 | House | Amended |
2019-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2019-03-14 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Albright |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2019 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee