OK HB2017 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2017
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings; requiring baby changing tables; effective date.
Title
Public buildings; requiring baby changing tables; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Albright [D] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] |
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Chelsey Branham [D] | Rep. Denise Brewer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Brewer, Echols |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-13 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens, Lawson, Branham |
2020-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Albright |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2017 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee