OK HB2009 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2009
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; providing separate penalties for persons previously convicted of certain offenses; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; providing separate penalties for persons previously convicted of certain offenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Coleman, Daniels, Bice, Jech, Brooks, Floyd, Shaw, Matthews |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Dunnington |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 9 |
2019-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Mize |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2009 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - CCR submitted