OK HB2009 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2009

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; requiring the State Department of Education to annually publish certain report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; requiring the State Department of Education to annually publish certain report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2018
2018-05-03HouseSent to Governor
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-05-03HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-05-03HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 25; Ayes: 53 Nays: 21
2018-05-03HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-04-26HouseSA's received
2018-04-26SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
2018-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-04-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-04-23SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Smalley
2018-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 29; Ayes: 68 Nays: 28
2018-03-14HouseAmended
2018-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-27HouseEmergency added
2018-02-27HouseRemove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Rogers
2018-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Common Education
2018-02-26HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2009 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
703104New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2009&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2009%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2009%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2009%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2009%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2009%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2009%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2009%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2009_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2009_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback