OK HB2001 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2001

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Wildlife
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Game and fish; prohibiting the requirement of certain persons to tag or to purchase a tag for bears; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; prohibiting the requirement of certain persons to tag or to purchase a tag for bears; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11SenateFailed in Committee - Agriculture and Wildlife
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2017-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-27HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-23HouseMotion expired
2017-03-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative West (Rick)
2017-03-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 31
2017-03-22HouseTitle stricken
2017-03-22HouseAmended
2017-03-22HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2017-03-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John)
2017-03-22HouseGeneral Order
2017-03-01HouseRemove Representative Jordan as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Rick)
2017-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Administrative Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Jordan
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2001 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Wildlife

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
295701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback