OK HB1999 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Approved by Governor 03/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Meat inspection; modifying horsemeat regulation; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Meat inspection; modifying horsemeat regulation; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01HouseApproved by Governor 03/29/2013
2013-03-27HouseSent to Governor
2013-03-27SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2013-03-27HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2013-03-26HouseReferred for enrollment
2013-03-26SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2013-03-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14
2013-03-26SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-03-18SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed
2013-03-12SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2013-02-21SenateFirst Reading
2013-02-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-02-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-02-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 14
2013-02-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Newell, Blackwell, McBride, Wood, Bennett, Cockroft, McDaniel (Curtis), Cannaday
2013-02-20HouseGeneral Order
2013-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author)
2013-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2013-02-06HouseReferred to Public Health Committee
2013-02-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
2013-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2013-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McNiel
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26182New CodeSee Bill Text
26192New CodeSee Bill Text
6311135Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6311136Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6311137Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6311138Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6311139Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback