OK HB1993 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; adding definitions; requiring individual service plan to provide least-restrictive placement information; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; adding definitions; requiring individual service plan to provide least-restrictive placement information; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseApproved by Governor 05/06/2019
2019-05-01HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-01SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-01HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-30HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-30HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
2019-04-30HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Nollan
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1993&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1993%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1993%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1993%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1993%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1993%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1993%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1993_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1993_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback