OK HB1992 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1992
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset; State Accrediting Agency; re-creating agency; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; State Accrediting Agency; re-creating agency; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: ADOPT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: ADOPT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Approved by Governor 05/17/2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-10 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 13 |
2017-05-10 | House | Ayes: 71 Nays: 17 |
2017-05-10 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Simpson |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-09 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-09 | House | General Order |
2017-02-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1992 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2017