OK HB1979 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Vetoed 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; creating the TBI Advisory Council; providing certain services for individuals with traumatic brain injury; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; creating the TBI Advisory Council; providing certain services for individuals with traumatic brain injury; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseVetoed 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-21SenateCCR read
2019-05-21HouseTo Senate
2019-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 5
2019-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-15HouseTitle restored
2019-05-15HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Rader, Smalley, Daniels, Standridge, Ikley-Freeman, Hicks
2019-04-23HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
2019-04-17HouseSA's received
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-10SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11
2019-03-14HouseAmended
2019-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2019-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Ranson
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1979&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1979%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1979%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1979%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1979%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1979%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1979%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1979%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1979_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1979_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback