OK HB1966 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Organized retail theft; creating the Organized Retail Crime Act; effective date.
Title
Organized retail theft; creating the Organized Retail Crime Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 31 |
2015-03-09 | House | Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | House Rule suspended |
2015-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1743 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1743 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1743 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1743 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |