OK HB1965 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-32-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-32-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating the Trooper Nicholas Dees and Trooper Keith Burch Act of 2015; relating to the unlawful use of cellular device while driving; modifying scope of certain prohibited act; clarifying language; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating the Trooper Nicholas Dees and Trooper Keith Burch Act of 2015; relating to the unlawful use of cellular device while driving; modifying scope of certain prohibited act; clarifying language; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 23 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 30 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 23 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 30 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2015 |
2015-04-30 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-30 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-29 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7 |
2015-04-29 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives except Cockroft, Faught, Fisher, Fourkiller, Hall, Kern, McPeak, Morrissette, Murdock, Murphey, Newell, Strohm, Wesselhoft |
2015-04-29 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Garrison, Paddack, Matthews, Pittman, Sparks, Wyrick |
2015-04-29 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-08 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Sharp; authored by Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Denney |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2 |
2015-02-24 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2015-02-24 | House | Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Sharp (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Perryman, Christian, Sherrer, Virgin, Brown, Shelton, Montgomery, McDaniel (Jeannie), Hoskin |
2015-02-24 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rogers |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 11 | 901c | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 901d | Amended Code | See Bill Text |