OK HB1964 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Vetoed 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Vetoed 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure; mandating receiver liability for willful misconduct or gross negligence; effective date; emergency.
Title
Civil procedure; mandating receiver liability for willful misconduct or gross negligence; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Vetoed 06/04/2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-21 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-19 | House | Emergency restored |
2015-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2015-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Sykes, Crain, Griffin, Thompson, Sparks, Floyd |
2015-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |