OK HB1957 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Agriculture; licensing and permits for swine feeding operations; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; licensing and permits for swine feeding operations; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-11 Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
2011-05-05 Sent to Governor
2011-05-05 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2011-05-05 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2011-05-04 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-04 Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 3
2011-05-04 SA's read, adopted
2011-04-27 SA's received
2011-04-27 Engrossed to House
2011-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-26 Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11
2011-04-26 General Order, Considered
2011-04-06 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed
2011-03-22 Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2011-03-16 First Reading
2011-03-16 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-15 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5
2011-03-15 General Order
2011-03-02 Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author)
2011-03-02 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment
2011-02-07 Authored by Representative McNiel
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22021New CodeSee Bill Text
2206New CodeSee Bill Text
29210New CodeSee Bill Text
82102011aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback