OK HB1954 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to manufacturing exemptions; expanding manufacturer exemption to include sale to entities in certain contractual relationships; requiring certain documentation; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to manufacturing exemptions; expanding manufacturer exemption to include sale to entities in certain contractual relationships; requiring certain documentation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 49 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 50 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: TABLE ADV (Y: 29 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House: R (Y: 52 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: RECONSIDER A (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 33 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House: APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: A (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: (Y: 52 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 49 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 50 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: TABLE ADV (Y: 29 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House: R (Y: 52 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: RECONSIDER A (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 33 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House: APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: A (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: (Y: 52 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 9 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2011-05-04 | SCs named GCCA | |
2011-05-04 | SCs removed Mazzei, Brinkley, Halligan, Simpson, Wilson, Sparks | |
2011-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Mazzei, Brinkley, Halligan, Simpson, Wilson, Sparks | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2011-04-07 | SA's received | |
2011-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-31 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Motion expired | |
2011-03-10 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Blackwell | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40; Ayes: 49 Nays: 42 | |
2011-03-10 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-03-10 | Motion to reconsider adoption of amendment adopted: Ayes: 54 Nays: 34 | |
2011-03-10 | Returned to General Order: Ayes: 52 Nays: 39 | |
2011-03-10 | Motion to rescind Third Reading adopted: Ayes 52 Nays: 33 | |
2011-03-10 | Placed on Third Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 52 Nays: 28 | |
2011-03-10 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McNiel | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 50 | |
2011-03-10 | Amended | |
2011-03-10 | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-10 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative McNiel | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |