OK HB1950 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1950
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Coauthored by Representative Pittman
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Coauthored by Representative Pittman
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; credits for landlords; Oklahoma Tax Commission; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; credits for landlords; Oklahoma Tax Commission; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Cruz [D] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 20 |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | Title stricken |
2021-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Cruz |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1950 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Coauthored by Representative Pittman