OK HB1950 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1950
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Motor fuel tax fees; re-creating the Motor Fuels Tax Fee; establishing fee; State Highway Construction and Maintenance Fund; apportionment; repealer; effective date.
Title
Motor fuel tax fees; re-creating the Motor Fuels Tax Fee; establishing fee; State Highway Construction and Maintenance Fund; apportionment; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: F DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: F DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: F DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1950 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Title stricken